Felix Martin Julius Steiner (23 May 1896 – 12 May 1966) was a German Reichswehr and Waffen-SS officer who served in both World War I and World War II.
Attributes | Values |
---|
rdf:type
| |
rdfs:label
| - Felix Steiner
- Felix Steiner
- Felix Steiner
|
rdfs:comment
| - Felix Martin Julius Steiner (23 May 1896 – 12 May 1966) was a German Reichswehr and Waffen-SS officer who served in both World War I and World War II.
- Felix Martin Julius Steiner (23 May 1896 – 12 May 1966) was a German officer, who became Obergruppenführer of the Schutzstaffel, General of the Waffen-SS, and a signed-up member of the Nazi Party of Nazi Germany. He served in both World War I and World War II and was awarded the Knight's Cross of the Iron Cross with Oak Leaves and Swords. He significantly contributed, together with Paul Hausser, to the development and transformation of the Waffen-SS, as an armed wing of the Nazi Party's Schutzstaffel, into a multi-ethnic and multinational military force of Nazi Germany.
- Felix Martin Julius Steiner (23. toukokuuta 1896 Stallupönen – 12. toukokuuta 1966 München) oli saksalainen Waffen-SS-kenraali (SS-Obergruppenführer). Steiner palveli molemmissa maailmansodissa. Ensimmäisessä maailmansodassa Steiner saavutti luutnantin arvon ja sai 1. ja 2. luokan rautaristit. Toisessa maailmansodassa hän toimi muun muassa 1940 Ranskan taisteluiden osallistuneen SS-divisioona Das Reichiin kuuluvanSS-rykmentti Deutschlandin komentajana, 5. SS-divisioona Wikingin ja III SS-panssariarmeijakunnan komentajana. Hänet palkittiin rautaristin ritariristillä tammenlehvin ja miekoin.
|
sameAs
| |
dcterms:subject
| |
Row 4 info
| - Not being in Downfall
- Replacing Erich Kempka as Hitler's driver
- His failure to advance prompted the now-famous Hitler rant scene
|
Row 1 info
| - Felix Martin Julius Steiner
|
Row 4 title
| |
Row 2 info
| |
Row 1 title
| |
Row 5 info
| - Adolf Hitler, Hans Krebs, Traudl Junge, Helmuth Weidling, Alfred Jodl, drunk Wilhelm Burgdorf
|
Row 2 title
| |
Row 5 title
| |
Row 3 info
| |
Row 3 title
| |
dbkwik:hitlerparod...iPageUsesTemplate
| |
dbkwik:military/pr...iPageUsesTemplate
| |
serviceyears
| |
Box Title
| |
Birth Date
| |
Commands
| - SS-Standarte Deutschland, SS-Division (mot.) Germania, 5th. SS-Panzer Division Wiking and III.(germanische) SS-Panzerkorps.
|
Branch
| |
death place
| |
Name
| |
Caption
| - Steiner as an SS-Gruppenführer
|
dbkwik:fi.ww2books...iPageUsesTemplate
| |
dbkwik:fr.illogico...iPageUsesTemplate
| |
imagewidth
| |
Birth Place
| |
Title
| - Commander of 5. SS-Panzer-Division Wiking
- Commander of III.(germanische) SS-Panzerkorps
- Commander of 11.SS-Panzerarmee
- Commander of Army Detachment Steiner
- Commander of SS-Standarte "Deutschland"
|
Awards
| |
death date
| |
Rank
| |
Before
| - none
- Generalleutnant Martin Unrein
|
Years
| - --05-01
- --01-28
- --12-01
- --03-05
- --04-21
|
After
| - none
- SS-Obergruppenführer Georg Keppler
- General der Infanterie Otto Hitzfeld
- SS-Obergruppenführer Herbert Otto Gille
|
abstract
| - Felix Martin Julius Steiner (23 May 1896 – 12 May 1966) was a German officer, who became Obergruppenführer of the Schutzstaffel, General of the Waffen-SS, and a signed-up member of the Nazi Party of Nazi Germany. He served in both World War I and World War II and was awarded the Knight's Cross of the Iron Cross with Oak Leaves and Swords. He significantly contributed, together with Paul Hausser, to the development and transformation of the Waffen-SS, as an armed wing of the Nazi Party's Schutzstaffel, into a multi-ethnic and multinational military force of Nazi Germany. Steiner was chosen by Heinrich Himmler to oversee the creation of, and command an elite Panzer division, the 5th SS Panzer Division Wiking. In 1943, he was promoted to the command of the III (Germanic) SS Panzer Corps. On 28 January 1945, Steiner was placed in command of the 11th SS Panzer Army, which formed part of a new ad-hoc formation to protect Berlin from the Soviet armies advancing from the Vistula River. On 21 April, during the Battle for Berlin, Steiner was placed in command of Army Detachment Steiner, while Adolf Hitler ordered Steiner to envelop the 1st Belorussian Front through a pincer movement, advancing from the North of the city. However, as his worn out and exhausted unit was outnumbered by ten to one, Steiner made it clear that he did not have the capacity for a counter-attack. It resulted in Hitler falling into a tearful rage on 22 April during the daily situation conference in the Führerbunker. After the capitulation of Germany, Steiner was imprisoned and indicted as part of the Nuremberg Trials. However, he was cleared of all charges of war crimes and released in 1948. He continued to live in Germany, wrote several books, and participated in organising support for former Waffen-SS members. He died on 12 May 1966.
- Felix Martin Julius Steiner (23 May 1896 – 12 May 1966) was a German Reichswehr and Waffen-SS officer who served in both World War I and World War II.
- Felix Martin Julius Steiner (23. toukokuuta 1896 Stallupönen – 12. toukokuuta 1966 München) oli saksalainen Waffen-SS-kenraali (SS-Obergruppenführer). Steiner palveli molemmissa maailmansodissa. Ensimmäisessä maailmansodassa Steiner saavutti luutnantin arvon ja sai 1. ja 2. luokan rautaristit. Toisessa maailmansodassa hän toimi muun muassa 1940 Ranskan taisteluiden osallistuneen SS-divisioona Das Reichiin kuuluvanSS-rykmentti Deutschlandin komentajana, 5. SS-divisioona Wikingin ja III SS-panssariarmeijakunnan komentajana. Hänet palkittiin rautaristin ritariristillä tammenlehvin ja miekoin. Keväällä 1945 Steiner osallistui Berliinin puolustukseen johtamillaan, 11. SS-Panssariarmeijalla ja III. SS Germanische -panssariarmeijakunnan komentajana.
|
is Commander
of | |
is notable commanders
of | |