Sion Hart Rogers (September 30, 1825 – August 14, 1874) was a U.S. Congressman from and Attorney General of North Carolina. Born near Raleigh, Rogers was admitted to the bar in 1848 and commenced practice in Raleigh. As a Whig, he served one term in Congress (1853-1855). During the American Civil War, he served in the Confederate States Army as a lieutenant in the Fourteenth Regiment of North Carolina State Troops in 1861; was commissioned colonel of the 47th North Carolina Infantry on April 8, 1862, and resigned January 5, 1863, upon being elected attorney general of the State of North Carolina. He again served in United States Congress from 1871-1873, this time as a Democrat, and died only two years after failing to win reelection.
Attributes | Values |
---|
rdf:type
| |
rdfs:label
| |
rdfs:comment
| - Sion Hart Rogers (September 30, 1825 – August 14, 1874) was a U.S. Congressman from and Attorney General of North Carolina. Born near Raleigh, Rogers was admitted to the bar in 1848 and commenced practice in Raleigh. As a Whig, he served one term in Congress (1853-1855). During the American Civil War, he served in the Confederate States Army as a lieutenant in the Fourteenth Regiment of North Carolina State Troops in 1861; was commissioned colonel of the 47th North Carolina Infantry on April 8, 1862, and resigned January 5, 1863, upon being elected attorney general of the State of North Carolina. He again served in United States Congress from 1871-1873, this time as a Democrat, and died only two years after failing to win reelection.
|
dcterms:subject
| |
type of appearance
| |
dbkwik:turtledove/...iPageUsesTemplate
| |
Timeline
| |
Name
| |
Affiliations
| |
Occupation
| - Politician
- Lawyer, Politician, Soldier
|
Death
| |
Birth
| |
Nationality
| |
abstract
| - Sion Hart Rogers (September 30, 1825 – August 14, 1874) was a U.S. Congressman from and Attorney General of North Carolina. Born near Raleigh, Rogers was admitted to the bar in 1848 and commenced practice in Raleigh. As a Whig, he served one term in Congress (1853-1855). During the American Civil War, he served in the Confederate States Army as a lieutenant in the Fourteenth Regiment of North Carolina State Troops in 1861; was commissioned colonel of the 47th North Carolina Infantry on April 8, 1862, and resigned January 5, 1863, upon being elected attorney general of the State of North Carolina. He again served in United States Congress from 1871-1873, this time as a Democrat, and died only two years after failing to win reelection.
|