rdfs:comment
| - Covington (PF-56) was launched on 15 July 1943 by Globe Shipbuilding Co., Superior, Wisconsin, under a Maritime Commission contract; sponsored by Miss. J. Phillips; transferred to the Navy on 5 August 1944; placed in "ferry" commission on 7 August 1944; and commissioned in full on 17 October 1944, Lieutenant Commander F. S. Brown, USCGR, in command.
|
abstract
| - Covington (PF-56) was launched on 15 July 1943 by Globe Shipbuilding Co., Superior, Wisconsin, under a Maritime Commission contract; sponsored by Miss. J. Phillips; transferred to the Navy on 5 August 1944; placed in "ferry" commission on 7 August 1944; and commissioned in full on 17 October 1944, Lieutenant Commander F. S. Brown, USCGR, in command. Covington arrived at NS Argentia, Newfoundland, on 25 December 1944 for duty as a weather patrol vessel. She remained on this duty, except for overhauls at Boston and Charleston, South Carolina until 16 March 1946 when she was decommissioned and loaned to the Coast Guard. Covington was returned from the Coast Guard on 17 September 1946, and sold to Ecuador through the Foreign Liquidation Commission of the State Department on 28 August 1947. Covington was renamed BAE Guayas (E-21) and served as the flagship of the Ecuadorian Navy until 1967, when she was replaced in that duty by 25 de Julio (the former USS Enright). Guayas was decommissioned in 1972 and stricken in 1974.
|